ID S1336 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Signed by Governor on 03/22/16 Session Law Chapter 98 Effective: 03/22/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Signed by Governor on 03/22/16 Session Law Chapter 98 Effective: 03/22/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION - Amends existing law to provide an exception to a certain testing requirement.
Title
Amends existing law to provide an exception to a certain testing requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/22/16 Session Law Chapter 98 Effective: 03/22/2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor at 11 a.m. on 03/16/16 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2016-03-15 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2016-03-10 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-10 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-10 | House | PASSED -- 69-0-1 |
2016-03-10 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-03-09 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-03 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2016-03-03 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-03-02 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-02 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-1 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |