ID S1278 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
Pending: House Resources and Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation
Pending: House Resources and Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
REAL PROPERTY -- Adds to existing law to provide that certain appurtenant water rights and water entitlements and obligations shall pass with the transfer of real property.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide that certain appurtenant water rights and water entitlements and obligations shall pass with the transfer of real property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2022-02-24 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | to House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 29-0-6 |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |