ID S1259 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 77 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 77 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and repeals existing law relating to agriculture to revise the name of an association; to provide that members shall serve at the pleasure of the Governor, to provide that the Governor may withdraw a commissioner's appointment upon receipt of the Executive Committee's request for removal; to provide that two or more commission members may make a written request for a meeting; to provide for the solicitation of grants, donations and gifts by the commission; to provide that the commission may require that the executive director or any agent or employee appointed by the commission be bonded; and to revise provisions relating to the maximum tax per bushel on certain wheat.
Title
Amends and repeals existing law relating to agriculture to revise the name of an association; to provide that members shall serve at the pleasure of the Governor, to provide that the Governor may withdraw a commissioner's appointment upon receipt of the Executive Committee's request for removal; to provide that two or more commission members may make a written request for a meeting; to provide for the solicitation of grants, donations and gifts by the commission; to provide that the commission may require that the executive director or any agent or employee appointed by the commission be bonded; and to revise provisions relating to the maximum tax per bushel on certain wheat.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 77 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-16 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/15 | |
2012-03-15 | To Governor | |
2012-03-15 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-14 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-14 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-14 | To enrol | |
2012-03-13 | to Senate | |
2012-03-13 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-13 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 52-13-5 | |
2012-02-24 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-24 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-23 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-23 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-23 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-15 | to Agric Aff | |
2012-02-15 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-15 | House intro | |
2012-02-14 | to House | |
2012-02-14 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-14 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 31-4-0 | |
2012-02-10 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-10 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-08 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-08 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-08 | Rpt out | |
2012-01-26 | to Agric Aff | |
2012-01-26 | Rpt prt | |
2012-01-25 | to printing | |
2012-01-25 | 1st rdg | |
2012-01-25 | Senate intro |