ID S1143 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 166 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 166 Effective: 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FISH AND GAME -- Adds to existing law to provide for seasonal restrictions regarding antlers and horns to protect wintering big game.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide for seasonal restrictions regarding antlers and horns to protect wintering big game.
Sponsors
Senate State Affairs Committee | Sen. Mark Harris [R] | Rep. Britt Raybould [R] | Rep. Richard Cheatum [R] |
Rep. Josh Wheeler [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 166 Effective: 07/01/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2023-03-28 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2023-03-24 | House | to Senate |
2023-03-24 | House | Title apvd |
2023-03-24 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 45-22-3 |
2023-03-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-03-23 | House | U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day |
2023-03-22 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-21 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2023-03-20 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2023-03-20 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2023-03-20 | Senate | to House |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 25-10-0 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Resources & Environment |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |