ID S1092 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Session Law Chapter 177 Effective: 03/27/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Session Law Chapter 177 Effective: 03/27/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RENEWAL OF JUDGMENTS -- Amends existing law to provide that a renewed judgment may be recorded in the same manner as the original judgment, and the lien established thereby shall continue for 10 years from the date of the renewed judgment.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that a renewed judgment may be recorded in the same manner as the original judgment, and the lien established thereby shall continue for 10 years from the date of the renewed judgment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 177 Effective: 03/27/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-21 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-03-16 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-16 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-16 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2 |
2017-03-15 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-14 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-01 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration |
2017-03-01 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | to House |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |