ID S1034 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 89 Effective: 03/20/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Session Law Chapter 89 Effective: 03/20/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to remove a requirement for a broadband infrastructure improvement grant and to revise the duty of the State Board of Education to make certain rules.
Title
Amends existing law to remove a requirement for a broadband infrastructure improvement grant and to revise the duty of the State Board of Education to make certain rules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Senate | Session Law Chapter 89 Effective: 03/20/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2017-03-14 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2017-03-09 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-09 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-09 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 67-0-3 |
2017-03-08 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-15 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Education |
2017-02-15 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2017-02-14 | Senate | to House |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read third time in full as amended -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read second time as amended, filed for Third reading |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read first time as amended, filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reported out without recommendation, as amended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Education |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |