ID H0494 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
GROCERY TAXES -- Amends existing law to revise the grocery tax credit.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the grocery tax credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-03-17 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-03-12 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-03-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Thursday, March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Tuesday, March 10, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Friday, March 6, 2020 |
2020-02-28 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Tuesday, March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Friday, February 28, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-02-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Tuesday, February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-02-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2020/legislation/H0494/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2020/legislation/H0494.pdf |