ID H0170 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2017 Session Law Chapter 136 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2017 Session Law Chapter 136 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FISH, WILDLIFE AND WATER RESOURCES -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding Idaho's primacy over the management of its fish, wildlife and water resources and to provide that any introduction or reintroduction without state consultation and approval is prohibited.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding Idaho's primacy over the management of its fish, wildlife and water resources and to provide that any introduction or reintroduction without state consultation and approval is prohibited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2017 Session Law Chapter 136 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:50 a.m. on March 21, 2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-14 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 27-5-3 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-02-27 | House | to Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | Title apvd |
2017-02-27 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 59-11-0 |
2017-02-24 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 27, 2017 |
2017-02-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |