ID H0147 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

INSURANCE DATA SECURITY ACT -- Adds to existing law to establish the Insurance Data Security Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to establish the Insurance Data Security Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10HouseFiled in Office of the Chief Clerk
2021-03-10HouseRules Suspended:
2021-03-10HouseRead second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading
2021-03-09HouseRead first time as amended; filed for Second Reading
2021-03-09HouseReported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills
2021-03-08HouseBill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing
2021-03-08HouseAmendments Referred to the JRA for Printing
2021-03-08HouseReported out without recommendation as amended
2021-03-08HouseReferred to the Committee of the Whole
2021-03-04HouseReported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders
2021-02-15HouseReported Printed and Referred to Business
2021-02-12HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback