ID H0061 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - U.C. to be returned to Transportation & Defense Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - U.C. to be returned to Transportation & Defense Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES -- Amends existing law to increase fees for snowmobile use and to allocate such funds regarding snowmobile use and opportunities.
Title
Amends existing law to increase fees for snowmobile use and to allocate such funds regarding snowmobile use and opportunities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | U.C. to be returned to Transportation & Defense Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Thursday, February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-11 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Thursday, February 18, 2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-01 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2021-01-29 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |