ID H0061 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 15 Effective: 05/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 15 Effective: 05/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to motor vehicles and crimes and punishments to delete language relating to a person refusing to submit to or failing to complete certain evidentiary testing, to revise a penalty provision if a motorist refuses to submit to or complete certain evidentiary testing; and to revise provisions relating to a request for a hearing.
Title
Amends existing law relating to motor vehicles and crimes and punishments to delete language relating to a person refusing to submit to or failing to complete certain evidentiary testing, to revise a penalty provision if a motorist refuses to submit to or complete certain evidentiary testing; and to revise provisions relating to a request for a hearing.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 15 Effective: 05/01/11 | |
2011-02-24 | Delivered to Governor on 02/23 | |
2011-02-23 | To Governor | |
2011-02-22 | Pres signed | |
2011-02-21 | Sp signed | |
2011-02-21 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-02-18 | To enrol | |
2011-02-17 | to House | |
2011-02-17 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-17 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2011-02-16 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-16 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-15 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-15 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-15 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-09 | to Jud | |
2011-02-09 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-09 | Senate intro | |
2011-02-08 | to Senate | |
2011-02-08 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-08 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 64-2-4 | |
2011-02-04 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-04 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-03 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-03 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-03 | Rpt out | |
2011-01-28 | to Transp | |
2011-01-28 | Rpt prt | |
2011-01-27 | to printing | |
2011-01-27 | 1st rdg | |
2011-01-27 | House intro |