IA SSB3150 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2338
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2338.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2338.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to civil actions, including the total amount recoverable as a noneconomic damages award against a health care provider and evidence offered to prove past medical expenses.
Title
A bill for an act relating to civil actions, including the total amount recoverable as a noneconomic damages award against a health care provider and evidence offered to prove past medical expenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2338. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2020 11:00AM RM G17. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Whiting, Kinney, and Nunn. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Whiting, Kinney, and Nunn. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SF2338 (Replaced by) 2020-06-18 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 864.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB3150 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB3150.html |