IA SF2338 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 864.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 864.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to civil actions, including recoverable damages for medical expenses, evidence offered to prove past medical expenses, and civil actions related to the novel coronavirus, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3150.) Effective date: 07/01/2020. Applicability date: 01/01/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to civil actions, including recoverable damages for medical expenses, evidence offered to prove past medical expenses, and civil actions related to the novel coronavirus, and including retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3150.) Effective date: 07/01/2020. Applicability date: 01/01/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-05 - House - Passed House (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - House - Passed House (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 864. |
2020-06-16 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 862. |
2020-06-11 | House | Secretary's report on correction in enrollment. S.J. 781. |
2020-06-11 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 692. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 762. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 31, nays 18. S.J. 761. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5111. S.J. 761. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5130 to S-5111 filed, lost. S.J. 760. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5128 to S-5111 filed, lost. S.J. 760. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5126 to S-5111 filed, lost. S.J. 759. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5133 to S-5111 filed, lost. S.J. 758. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5125 to S-5111 filed, lost. S.J. 757. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5131 to S-5111 filed, lost. S.J. 757. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5129 to S-5111 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 757. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5127 to S-5111 filed, lost. S.J. 756. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 733. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5111. S.J. 715. |
2020-06-05 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 664. |
2020-06-05 | House | Passed House, yeas 52, nays 44. H.J. 664. |
2020-06-05 | House | Committee amendment H-8173 adopted, as amended. H.J. 662. |
2020-06-05 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 661. |
2020-06-05 | House | Motion to suspend rules for consideration of H-8236 to amendment H-8173. H.J. 660. |
2020-06-05 | House | Point of order raised on H-8236 to amendment H-8173, ruled not germane. H.J. 660. |
2020-06-05 | House | Amendment H-8236 to amendment H-8173 filed. H.J. 660. |
2020-06-05 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 660. |
2020-06-05 | House | Motion to suspend rules for consideration of H-8216 to amendment H-8173. H.J. 659. |
2020-06-05 | House | Point of order raised on H-8216 to amendment H-8173, ruled not germane. H.J. 659. |
2020-06-05 | House | Amendment H-8216 to amendment H-8173 filed. H.J. 659. |
2020-06-05 | House | Amendment H-8204 to amendment H-8173 adopted. H.J. 659. |
2020-06-05 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 658. |
2020-06-05 | House | Motion to suspend rules for consideration of H-8235 to amendment H-8173. H.J. 657. |
2020-06-05 | House | Point of order raised on H-8235 to amendment H-8173, ruled not germane. H.J. 656. |
2020-06-05 | House | Amendment H-8235 to amendment H-8173 filed. H.J. 656. |
2020-06-04 | House | Amendment H-8204 filed. H.J. 646. |
2020-06-03 | House | Committee amendment H-8173 filed. H.J. 632. |
2020-06-03 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 630. |
2020-06-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-06-02 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 06/03/2020 11:30AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2020-03-12 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Carlson, Meyer, B. and Wills. H.J. 594. |
2020-03-09 | House | Subcommittee: Carlson, Jacobsen and Meyer, B.. H.J. 533. |
2020-03-03 | House | Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 421. |
2020-02-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 371. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 415. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 30, nays 20. S.J. 415. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Amendment S-5020 filed, lost. S.J. 414. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 360. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 354. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3150 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2338.