IA SSB1214 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF482
Note: Legislation replaced by HF782
Note: Legislation replaced by HF782
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act regulating the application of pesticides, including by providing for the certification of applicators, and certain actions taken by the department of agriculture and land stewardship against private applicators, and providing penalties.(See SF 482.)
Title
A bill for an act regulating the application of pesticides, including by providing for the certification of applicators, and certain actions taken by the department of agriculture and land stewardship against private applicators, and providing penalties.(See SF 482.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 482. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2021 12:30PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: Driscoll, Kinney, and Zumbach. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Agriculture. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB249 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 782.
SF482 (Replaced by) 2021-03-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 666.
HF782 (Replaced by) 2021-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 697.
SF482 (Replaced by) 2021-03-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 666.
HF782 (Replaced by) 2021-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 697.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1214 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1214.html |