IA HSB249 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF482
Note: Legislation replaced by HF782
Note: Legislation replaced by HF782
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 782.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 782.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act regulating the application of pesticides, including by providing for the certification of applicators, and certain actions taken by the department of agriculture and land stewardship against private applicators, and providing penalties.(See HF 782.)
Title
A bill for an act regulating the application of pesticides, including by providing for the certification of applicators, and certain actions taken by the department of agriculture and land stewardship against private applicators, and providing penalties.(See HF 782.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 782. |
2021-03-03 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 593. |
2021-03-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1 |
2021-02-25 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2021 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2021-02-24 | House | Subcommittee: Ingels, Hansen and Sieck. H.J. 549. |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 547. |
2021-02-24 | House | By COMMITTEE ON AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1214 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 482.
SF482 (Replaced by) 2021-03-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 666.
HF782 (Replaced by) 2021-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 697.
SF482 (Replaced by) 2021-03-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 666.
HF782 (Replaced by) 2021-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 697.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB249 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB249.html |