IA HF782 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 697.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 697.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act regulating the application of pesticides, including by providing for the certification of applicators, and certain actions taken by the department of agriculture and land stewardship against private applicators, and providing penalties.(Formerly HSB 249.)
Title
A bill for an act regulating the application of pesticides, including by providing for the certification of applicators, and certain actions taken by the department of agriculture and land stewardship against private applicators, and providing penalties.(Formerly HSB 249.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 697. |
2021-03-10 | House | SF 482 substituted. H.J. 693. |
2021-03-05 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 610. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1214 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 482.
HSB249 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 782.
SF482 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 666.
HSB249 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 782.
SF482 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 666.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF782 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF782.html |