IA SSB1198 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF516

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 516.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the management of open space properties and recreational trails.(See SF 516.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the management of open space properties and recreational trails.(See SF 516.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-06SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 516.
2023-03-01SenateSubcommittee recommends passage. [].
2023-02-28SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2023 7:30AM Room 217 Conference Room.
2023-02-27SenateSubcommittee: Sweeney, Knox, and Shipley.
2023-02-27SenateIntroduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment.
2023-02-27SenateBy COMMITTEE ON NATURAL RESOURCES AND ENVIRONMENT

Same As/Similar To

SF516 (Replaced by) 2023-03-29 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback