IA SF516 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the management of open space properties and recreational trails. (Formerly SSB 1198.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the management of open space properties and recreational trails. (Formerly SSB 1198.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources And Environment Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Natural Resources And Environment Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources And Environment Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Natural Resources And Environment Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2023-03-28 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/29/2023 12:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2023-03-23 | House | Subcommittee: Harris, Baeth and Wulf. H.J. 732. |
2023-03-23 | House | Rereferred to State Government. H.J. 731. |
2023-03-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2023-03-15 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/16/2023 10:30AM House Lounge. |
2023-03-15 | House | Subcommittee: Fisher, Baeth and Hayes. H.J. 653. |
2023-03-15 | House | Read first time, referred to Environmental Protection. H.J. 623. |
2023-03-14 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 603. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 568. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 33, nays 14. S.J. 567. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Amendment S-3071 filed, adopted. S.J. 567. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 506. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 492. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1198 (Related) 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 516.