GA SB36 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-6-13 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to penalties for violating Code Sections 16-6-9 through 16-6-12, so as to increase the penalty provisions relating to pimping and pandering; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Pimping and Pandering; penalty provisions; increase
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #25 (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |