IA SSB1015 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF201

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the sex offender registry including duration of registration requirements and sexually motivated extortion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the sex offender registry including duration of registration requirements and sexually motivated extortion.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2021-01-19SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/21/2021 10:00AM RM 111.
2021-01-12SenateSubcommittee: Whiting, Bolkcom, and Reichman.
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2021-01-12SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

HSB17 (Related) 2021-01-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 201.
HF201 (Replaced by) 2021-02-16 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback