IA HSB17 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF201
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 201.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 201.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the sex offender registry including duration of registration requirements and sexually motivated extortion.(See HF 201.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the sex offender registry including duration of registration requirements and sexually motivated extortion.(See HF 201.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 201. |
2021-01-21 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 178. |
2021-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 178. |
2021-01-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/14/2021 1:00PM RM 19. |
2021-01-12 | House | Subcommittee: Westrich, Klein and Wolfe. H.J. 71. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 69. |
2021-01-12 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1015 (Related) 2021-01-21 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF201 (Replaced by) 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1098.
HF201 (Replaced by) 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1098.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB17 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB17.html |