IA HF201 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1098.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1098.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the sex offender registry including duration of registration requirements and sexually motivated extortion. (Formerly HSB 17.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the sex offender registry including duration of registration requirements and sexually motivated extortion. (Formerly HSB 17.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1098. |
2021-05-10 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 1098. |
2021-04-28 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1030. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1008. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 1006. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3182, ruled not germane. S.J. 1005. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Amendment S-3182 filed. S.J. 1005. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 968. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 860. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 842. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 605. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/16/2021 1:00PM RM 111. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Whiting, Bolkcom, and Reichman. S.J. 313. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Petersen, and J. Taylor. S.J. 262. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 234. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 234. |
2021-02-02 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 281. |
2021-02-02 | House | Passed House, yeas 88, nays none. H.J. 269. |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 188. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1015 (Related) 2021-01-21 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB17 (Related) 2021-01-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 201.
HSB17 (Related) 2021-01-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 201.