IA SF619 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying provisions applicable to certain service contract providers regulated by the commissioner of insurance, providing fees, making penalties applicable, making an appropriation, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1223, SF 595.) Effective 5-16-19.
Title
A bill for an act modifying provisions applicable to certain service contract providers regulated by the commissioner of insurance, providing fees, making penalties applicable, making an appropriation, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1223, SF 595.) Effective 5-16-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1193. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1078. |
2019-04-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 979. |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 98 nays none. H.J. 958. |
2019-04-23 | House | Substituted for HF 747. H.J. 958. |
2019-04-22 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 930. |
2019-04-22 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 930. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1036. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 1036. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Amendment S-3194 filed, adopted. S.J. 1035. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Amendment S-3165 withdrawn. S.J. 1035. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Amendment S-3165 filed. S.J. 982. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 947. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 945. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB225 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 404.
SSB1223 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF665 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.
SF595 (Similar To) 2019-04-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 619. S.J. 947.
HF747 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.
SSB1223 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF665 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.
SF595 (Similar To) 2019-04-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 619. S.J. 947.
HF747 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.