IA HF747 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying provisions applicable to certain service contract providers regulated by the commissioner of insurance, providing fees, making penalties applicable, making an appropriation, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 665 and HSB 225.)
Title
A bill for an act modifying provisions applicable to certain service contract providers regulated by the commissioner of insurance, providing fees, making penalties applicable, making an appropriation, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 665 and HSB 225.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 980. |
2019-04-23 | House | SF 619 substituted. H.J. 958. |
2019-04-16 | House | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 602. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB225 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 404.
SSB1223 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF665 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.
SF595 (Similar To) 2019-04-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 619. S.J. 947.
SF619 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
SSB1223 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF665 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.
SF595 (Similar To) 2019-04-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 619. S.J. 947.
SF619 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF747 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF747.html |