IA SF58 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 197. S.J. 249.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 197. S.J. 249.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act allowing certain vans and pickups to be used to transport pupils to activity events or from school to home in emergency situations. (See SF 197.)
Title
A bill for an act allowing certain vans and pickups to be used to transport pupils to activity events or from school to home in emergency situations. (See SF 197.)
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Shipley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 197. S.J. 249. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, Kapucian, and Kinney. S.J. 158. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 108. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB39 (Related) 2019-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 241.
SF197 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Transportation. H.J. 1076.
HF343 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Transportation. H.J. 1076.
SF197 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Transportation. H.J. 1076.
HF343 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Transportation. H.J. 1076.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF58 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF58.html |