IA HSB39 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 241.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 241.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act allowing certain vans and pickups to be used to transport pupils to activity events or from school to home in emergency situations.
Title
A bill for an act allowing certain vans and pickups to be used to transport pupils to activity events or from school to home in emergency situations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 241. |
2019-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2019 11:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee: Thorup, Maxwell and R. Smith. H.J. 137. |
2019-01-23 | House | By COMMITTEE ON TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
SF58 (Replaced by) 2019-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 197. S.J. 249.
SF197 (Replaced by) 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Transportation. H.J. 1076.
HF343 (Replaced by) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Transportation. H.J. 1076.
SF197 (Replaced by) 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Transportation. H.J. 1076.
HF343 (Replaced by) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Transportation. H.J. 1076.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB39 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB39.html |