IA SF197 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Transportation. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Transportation. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act allowing certain vans and pickups to be used to transport pupils to activity events or from school to home in emergency situations. (Formerly SF 58.)
Title
A bill for an act allowing certain vans and pickups to be used to transport pupils to activity events or from school to home in emergency situations. (Formerly SF 58.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-27 | House | Rereferred to Transportation. H.J. 1076. |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 562. |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 503. |
2019-03-12 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 501. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 581. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 578. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 249. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 243. |
Same As/Similar To
SF58 (Similar To) 2019-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 197. S.J. 249.
HSB39 (Related) 2019-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 241.
HF343 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Transportation. H.J. 1076.
HSB39 (Related) 2019-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 241.
HF343 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Transportation. H.J. 1076.