IA SF513 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Human Resources. H.J. 1077.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the prescribing and dispensing of self-administered hormonal contraceptives. (Formerly SF 348.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the prescribing and dispensing of self-administered hormonal contraceptives. (Formerly SF 348.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-27HouseRereferred to Human Resources. H.J. 1077.
2019-03-28HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 675.
2019-03-28HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 673.
2019-03-27SenateImmediate message. S.J. 770.
2019-03-27SenatePassed Senate, yeas 42, nays 6. S.J. 767.
2019-03-27SenateAmendment S-3079 filed, adopted. S.J. 767.
2019-03-06SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 488.
2019-03-06SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 484.

Same As/Similar To

SF348 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Reported out of committee as SF 513. S.J. 488.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback