IA SF348 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 513. S.J. 488.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 513. S.J. 488.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the prescribing and dispensing of self-administered hormonal contraceptives. (See SF 513.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the prescribing and dispensing of self-administered hormonal contraceptives. (See SF 513.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 513. S.J. 488. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee: Miller-Meeks, Greene, and Jochum. S.J. 406. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 376. |
Same As/Similar To
SF513 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Human Resources. H.J. 1077.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF348 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF348.html |