IA SF512 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 726.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 726.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to consent agreements for domestic abuse and sexual abuse protective orders.(Formerly SF 428.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to consent agreements for domestic abuse and sexual abuse protective orders.(Formerly SF 428.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 726. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 499. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 494. |
Same As/Similar To
HF450 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 419.
SF428 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 512. S.J. 499.
HF825 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 868.
SF428 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 512. S.J. 499.
HF825 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 868.