IA SF428 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 512. S.J. 499.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 512. S.J. 499.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to consent agreements for domestic abuse and sexual abuse protective orders.(See SF 512.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to consent agreements for domestic abuse and sexual abuse protective orders.(See SF 512.)
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Mathis [D] | Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 512. S.J. 499. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2021 12:30PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Bisignano, and Reichman. S.J. 445. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 413. |
Same As/Similar To
HF450 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Withdrawn. H.J. 419.
SF512 (Similar To) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 726.
HF825 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 868.
SF512 (Similar To) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 726.
HF825 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 868.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF428 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF428.html |