IA SF472 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the judicial branch, and providing an effective date. (Formerly SSB 1323.) Various effective dates; see section 6 of bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the judicial branch, and providing an effective date. (Formerly SSB 1323.) Various effective dates; see section 6 of bill.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-05-04 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1282. | |
2009-04-26 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1279. | |
2009-04-26 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1279. | |
2009-04-26 | Secretary's report on correction in enrollment. S.J. 1278. | |
2009-04-16 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1489. | |
2009-04-16 | Immediate message. S.J. 1124. | |
2009-04-16 | Passed Senate, ayes 30, nays 19. S.J. 1122. | |
2009-04-16 | Senate concurred with S-3247. S.J. 1122. | |
2009-04-14 | Message from House, with amendment S-3247. S.J. 1080. | |
2009-04-13 | Immediate message. H.J. 1388. | |
2009-04-14 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1448. | |
2009-04-13 | Passed House, ayes 53, nays 43. H.J. 1387. | |
2009-04-13 | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 1387. | |
2009-04-13 | Motion to suspend rules to consider H-1538. H.J. 1386. | |
2009-04-13 | Ruled not germane H-1538. H.J. 1386. | |
2009-04-13 | Point of order raised H-1538 not germane. H.J. 1386. | |
2009-04-13 | Amendment H-1538 filed. H.J. 1385. | |
2009-04-13 | Amendment H-1537 adopted. H.J. 1385. | |
2009-04-13 | Amendment H-1537 filed. H.J. 1384. | |
2009-04-13 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1383. | |
2009-04-13 | Rule 31, timely filing of amendments, suspended. H.J. 1383. | |
2009-04-13 | Asked and received unanimous consent for the immediate consideration. H.J. 1383. | |
2009-04-08 | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 1253. | |
2009-04-07 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1206. | |
2009-04-07 | Immediate message. S.J. 999. | |
2009-04-07 | Passed Senate, ayes 30, nays 20. S.J. 997. | |
2009-04-07 | Amendment S-3209 filed, adopted. S.J. 997. | |
2009-04-06 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 977. | |
2009-04-06 | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 977. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0515B&ga=83 |