IA SF47 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 202. S.J. 249.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 202. S.J. 249.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to youth deer and youth wild turkey hunting licenses. (See SF 202; SF 610.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to youth deer and youth wild turkey hunting licenses. (See SF 202; SF 610.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 202. S.J. 249. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Boulton, and Zumbach. S.J. 126. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 87. |
Same As/Similar To
SF202 (Similar To) 2019-04-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 610. S.J. 827.
SF610 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF610 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF47 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF47.html |