IA SF610 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to youth deer and youth wild turkey hunting licenses, and providing effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 47, SF 202.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to youth deer and youth wild turkey hunting licenses, and providing effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 47, SF 202.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2020 10:00AM Room 223 - Charlie Smithson's Office. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Edler, and Giddens. S.J. 109. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 1191. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 827. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 824. |
Same As/Similar To
SF47 (Similar To) 2019-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 202. S.J. 249.
SF202 (Similar To) 2019-04-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 610. S.J. 827.
SF202 (Similar To) 2019-04-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 610. S.J. 827.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF610 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF610.html |