IA SF451 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 824.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to crime victims, including the collection of evidence in sexual abuse cases and the establishment of an automated tracking system involving sexual abuse evidence collection kits.(Formerly SSB 1104, SSB 1002.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to crime victims, including the collection of evidence in sexual abuse cases and the establishment of an automated tracking system involving sexual abuse evidence collection kits.(Formerly SSB 1104, SSB 1002.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07SenateWithdrawn. S.J. 824.
2021-04-07SenateHF 426 substituted. S.J. 823.
2021-04-01SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 725.
2021-03-10SenateAttached to similar HF 426. S.J. 572.
2021-02-24SenateFiscal note.
2021-02-24SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 458.
2021-02-24SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 454.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1002 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 451.
HSB24 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 300.
SSB1104 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Subcommittee: Whiting, Petersen, and Reichman.
HF426 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Message from Senate. H.J. 899.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback