IA SSB1104 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF426
Note: Legislation replaced by SF451
Note: Legislation replaced by SF451
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Subcommittee: Whiting, Petersen, and Reichman.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-28 - Subcommittee: Whiting, Petersen, and Reichman.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to crime victims, including the collection of evidence in sexual abuse cases and the establishment of an automated tracking system involving sexual abuse evidence collection kits.(Formerly SSB 1002; See SF 451.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to crime victims, including the collection of evidence in sexual abuse cases and the establishment of an automated tracking system involving sexual abuse evidence collection kits.(Formerly SSB 1002; See SF 451.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | Senate | Subcommittee: Whiting, Petersen, and Reichman. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1002 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 451.
HSB24 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 300.
HF426 (Replaced by) 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1201.
SF451 (Replaced by) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 824.
HSB24 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 300.
HF426 (Replaced by) 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1201.
SF451 (Replaced by) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 824.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1104 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1104.html |