IA HF426 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Message from Senate. H.J. 899.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to crime victims, including the collection of evidence in sexual abuse cases and the establishment of an automated tracking system involving sexual abuse evidence collection kits. (Formerly HSB 24.) Effective date: 07/01/2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to crime victims, including the collection of evidence in sexual abuse cases and the establishment of an automated tracking system involving sexual abuse evidence collection kits. (Formerly HSB 24.) Effective date: 07/01/2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 899.
2021-04-07SenateImmediate message. S.J. 828.
2021-04-07SenatePassed Senate, yeas 44, nays 0. S.J. 824.
2021-04-07SenateSubstituted for SF 451. S.J. 823.
2021-04-01SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 725.
2021-03-10SenateRead first time, attached to similar SF 451. S.J. 572.
2021-03-10SenateMessage from House. S.J. 572.
2021-03-09HouseImmediate message. H.J. 661.
2021-03-10HouseExplanations of votes. H.J. 698.
2021-03-09HousePassed House, yeas 93 nays none. H.J. 658.
2021-03-09HouseAmendment H-1149 adopted. H.J. 657.
2021-03-08HouseAmendment H-1149 filed. H.J. 647.
2021-02-10HouseFiscal note.
2021-02-08HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 308.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1002 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 451.
HSB24 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 300.
SSB1104 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Subcommittee: Whiting, Petersen, and Reichman.
SF451 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 824.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback