IA HSB24 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF426
Note: Legislation replaced by SF451

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 300.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to crime victims, including the collection of evidence in sexual abuse cases and the establishment of an automated tracking system involving sexual abuse evidence collection kits.(See HF 426.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to crime victims, including the collection of evidence in sexual abuse cases and the establishment of an automated tracking system involving sexual abuse evidence collection kits.(See HF 426.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 300.
2021-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2021-01-13HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 01/14/2021 1:30PM House Lounge.
2021-01-12HouseSubcommittee: Lohse, Westrich and Wilburn. H.J. 72.
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 70.
2021-01-12HouseBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

SSB1002 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 451.
SSB1104 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Subcommittee: Whiting, Petersen, and Reichman.
HF426 (Replaced by) 2021-04-07 - Message from Senate. H.J. 899.
SF451 (Replaced by) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 824.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback