IA SSB1002 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF426
Note: Legislation replaced by SF451

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 451.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to crime victims, including the collection of evidence in sexual abuse cases and the establishment of an automated tracking system involving sexual abuse evidence collection kits.(See SSB 1104, SF 451.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to crime victims, including the collection of evidence in sexual abuse cases and the establishment of an automated tracking system involving sexual abuse evidence collection kits.(See SSB 1104, SF 451.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 451.
2021-01-20SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2021-01-19SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/20/2021 12:30PM RM 24A.
2021-01-12SenateSubcommittee: Garrett, Kinney, and Schultz.
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2021-01-12SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

HSB24 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 300.
SSB1104 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Subcommittee: Whiting, Petersen, and Reichman.
HF426 (Replaced by) 2021-02-10 - Fiscal note.
SF451 (Replaced by) 2021-02-24 - Fiscal note.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback