IA SF420 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring American products to be used for public improvements, providing a penalty, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 70.)
Title
A bill for an act requiring American products to be used for public improvements, providing a penalty, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 70.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | Senate | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Economic Growth. S.J. 734. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 485. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 484. |