IA SF359 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 578. S.J. 596.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 578. S.J. 596.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the powers and duties of the department of agriculture and land stewardship, including by providing for administration, programs, and regulations, providing fees, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly SSB 1121; See SF 578.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the powers and duties of the department of agriculture and land stewardship, including by providing for administration, programs, and regulations, providing fees, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly SSB 1121; See SF 578.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 578. S.J. 596. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/09/2021 8:00AM RM 24A. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Sweeney, Brown, and Jochum. S.J. 509. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Jochum, and Sweeney. S.J. 390. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 352. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 348. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 345. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB95 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 827.
SSB1121 (Related) 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 359.
HF482 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
HF827 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
SF578 (Similar To) 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1151.
SSB1121 (Related) 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 359.
HF482 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
HF827 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
SF578 (Similar To) 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1151.