IA HF827 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the powers and duties of the department of agriculture and land stewardship, including by providing for administration, programs, and regulations, providing fees, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly HF 482, HSB 95.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the powers and duties of the department of agriculture and land stewardship, including by providing for administration, programs, and regulations, providing fees, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly HF 482, HSB 95.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 866. |
2021-03-29 | House | SF 578 substituted. H.J. 859. |
2021-03-29 | House | Amendment H-1281 adopted. H.J. 858. |
2021-03-24 | House | Amendment H-1281 filed. H.J. 833. |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 704. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB95 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 827.
SSB1121 (Related) 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 359.
HF482 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
SF359 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 578. S.J. 596.
SF578 (Similar To) 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1151.
SSB1121 (Related) 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 359.
HF482 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
SF359 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 578. S.J. 596.
SF578 (Similar To) 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1151.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF827 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF827.html |