IA SF578 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1151.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1151.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the powers and duties of the department of agriculture and land stewardship, including by providing for administration, programs, and regulations, providing fees, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 359, SSB 1121.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the powers and duties of the department of agriculture and land stewardship, including by providing for administration, programs, and regulations, providing fees, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 359, SSB 1121.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-07 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Shall division S–3180B be adopted? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Shall division S–3180A be adopted? (Y: 78 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Shall division S–3180B be adopted? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Shall division S–3180A be adopted? (Y: 78 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1151. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1149. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1049. |
2021-05-07 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1095. |
2021-05-18 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1174. |
2021-05-17 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1139. |
2021-05-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1101. |
2021-05-07 | House | Passed House, yeas 86, nays none. H.J. 1090. |
2021-05-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-1430. H.J. 1089. |
2021-04-28 | House | Senate amendment H-1430 filed. H.J. 1033. |
2021-04-28 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1024. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 986. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 983. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3107, as amended. S.J. 983. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Amendment S-3180B adopted. S.J. 982. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Amendment S-3180A adopted. S.J. 981. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Amendment S-3180 to S-3107 filed. S.J. 981. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Amendment S-3172 to S-3107 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 981. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3107. S.J. 709. |
2021-03-29 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 866. |
2021-03-29 | House | Passed House, yeas 94, nays none. H.J. 860. |
2021-03-29 | House | Amendment H-1293 adopted. H.J. 859. |
2021-03-29 | House | Amendment H-1282 withdrawn. H.J. 859. |
2021-03-29 | House | Substituted for HF 827. H.J. 859. |
2021-03-24 | House | Amendments H-1282 and H-1293 filed. H.J. 833. |
2021-03-23 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 766. |
2021-03-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 766. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 650. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 647. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Amendment S-3088 filed, adopted. S.J. 647. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 596. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 595. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB95 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 827.
SSB1121 (Related) 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 359.
HF482 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
SF359 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 578. S.J. 596.
HF827 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
SSB1121 (Related) 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 359.
HF482 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
SF359 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 578. S.J. 596.
HF827 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.