IA SF2414 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Withdrawn. S.J. 773.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-11 - Withdrawn. S.J. 773.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the future ready Iowa Act and other efforts to strengthen Iowa's workforce, including a child care challenge program for working Iowans, a workforce diploma pilot program, educational standards and online learning, and the senior year plus program, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SF 2313, SSB 3077.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the future ready Iowa Act and other efforts to strengthen Iowa's workforce, including a child care challenge program for working Iowans, a workforce diploma pilot program, educational standards and online learning, and the senior year plus program, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SF 2313, SSB 3077.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 773. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | HF 2629 substituted. S.J. 771. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Amendment S-5138 filed, adopted. S.J. 771. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 2629. S.J. 753. |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 709. |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 709. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3077 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2313.
HSB607 (Related) 2020-02-12 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 263.
HF2384 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
SF2313 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2414. S.J. 709.
HF2629 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 792.
HSB607 (Related) 2020-02-12 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 263.
HF2384 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
SF2313 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2414. S.J. 709.
HF2629 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 792.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2414 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2414.html |