IA SF2313 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2414. S.J. 709.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2414. S.J. 709.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the future ready Iowa Act and other efforts to strengthen Iowa's workforce, including a child care challenge program for working Iowans, a workforce diploma pilot program, computer science instruction, work-based learning coordinators, and the senior year plus program, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3077; See SF 2414.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the future ready Iowa Act and other efforts to strengthen Iowa's workforce, including a child care challenge program for working Iowans, a workforce diploma pilot program, computer science instruction, work-based learning coordinators, and the senior year plus program, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3077; See SF 2414.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2414. S.J. 709. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/03/2020 1:00PM RM G17. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Breitbach, and Mathis. S.J. 450. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 407. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 356. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 350. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3077 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2313.
HSB607 (Related) 2020-02-12 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 263.
HF2384 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
SF2414 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Withdrawn. S.J. 773.
HF2629 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 792.
HSB607 (Related) 2020-02-12 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 263.
HF2384 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
SF2414 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Withdrawn. S.J. 773.
HF2629 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 792.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2313 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2313.html |