IA HF2384 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the future ready Iowa Act and other efforts to strengthen Iowa's workforce, including a child care challenge program for working Iowans, a workforce diploma pilot program, computer science instruction, work-based learning coordinators, and the senior year plus program, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 607; See HF 2629.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the future ready Iowa Act and other efforts to strengthen Iowa's workforce, including a child care challenge program for working Iowans, a workforce diploma pilot program, computer science instruction, work-based learning coordinators, and the senior year plus program, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 607; See HF 2629.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 689. |
2020-06-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-06-03 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Mohr, G., Brink, Hall, Running-Marquardt and Sorensen. H.J. 630. |
2020-06-02 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 06/03/2020 11:15AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2020-03-03 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/05/2020 1:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-02-26 | House | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-24 | House | Subcommittee: Mohr, G., Brink, Hall, Running-Marquardt and Sorensen. H.J. 349. |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 270. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3077 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2313.
HSB607 (Related) 2020-02-12 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 263.
SF2313 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2414. S.J. 709.
SF2414 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Withdrawn. S.J. 773.
HF2629 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 792.
HSB607 (Related) 2020-02-12 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 263.
SF2313 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2414. S.J. 709.
SF2414 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Withdrawn. S.J. 773.
HF2629 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 792.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2384 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2384.html |