IA HF2629 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the future ready Iowa Act and other efforts to strengthen Iowa's workforce, including provisions relating to apprenticeship training programs, a child care challenge program for working Iowans, computer science educational standards, a scholarship program, and the senior year plus program, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 2384, HSB 607.) Effective date: 07/01/2021, 07/01/2020. Applicability date: 07/01/2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the future ready Iowa Act and other efforts to strengthen Iowa's workforce, including provisions relating to apprenticeship training programs, a child care challenge program for working Iowans, computer science educational standards, a scholarship program, and the senior year plus program, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HF 2384, HSB 607.) Effective date: 07/01/2021, 07/01/2020. Applicability date: 07/01/2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29SenateSigned by Governor.
2020-06-24SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
2020-06-12SenateMessage from House. S.J. 793.
2020-06-12HouseImmediate message. H.J. 722.
2020-06-12HousePassed House, yeas 97, nays none. H.J. 716.
2020-06-12HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment H-8270. H.J. 715.
2020-06-12HouseAmendment H-8289, to the Senate amendment H-8270 withdrawn. H.J. 715.
2020-06-11HouseFiscal note.
2020-06-11HouseAmendment H-8289 filed. H.J. 711.
2020-06-11HouseSenate amendment H-8270 filed. H.J. 711.
2020-06-11HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 693.
2020-06-11SenateImmediate message. S.J. 775.
2020-06-11SenatePassed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 773.
2020-06-11SenateAmendment S-5142 filed, lost. S.J. 772.
2020-06-11SenateAmendment S-5141 filed, adopted. S.J. 772.
2020-06-11SenateSubstituted for SF 2414. S.J. 771.
2020-06-10SenateRead first time, attached to similar SF 2414. S.J. 753.
2020-06-10SenateMessage from House. S.J. 753.
2020-06-10HouseImmediate message. H.J. 688.
2020-06-10HousePassed House, yeas 97, nays none. H.J. 681.
2020-06-10HouseFiscal note.
2020-06-10HouseAmendment H-8241 adopted. H.J. 680.
2020-06-09HouseAmendment H-8241 filed. H.J. 671.
2020-06-08HouseFiscal note.
2020-06-05HouseIntroduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 649.

Same As/Similar To

SSB3077 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2313.
HSB607 (Related) 2020-02-12 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 263.
HF2384 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
SF2313 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2414. S.J. 709.
SF2414 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Withdrawn. S.J. 773.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback