IA SF229 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Commerce. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Commerce. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the sale, lease, or rental of water treatment systems and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 25.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the sale, lease, or rental of water treatment systems and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 25.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-27 | House | Rereferred to Commerce. H.J. 1076. |
2019-03-14 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 562. |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 551. |
2019-03-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-03-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2019 10:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-03-05 | House | Subcommittee: Mitchell, Judge and Landon. H.J. 401. |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 339. |
2019-02-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 329. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 352. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 393. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 351. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 275. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 268. |
Same As/Similar To
SF25 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 229. S.J. 275.