IA SF25 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 229. S.J. 275.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 229. S.J. 275.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the sale, lease, or rental of water treatment systems and including effective date and applicability provisions. (See SF 229.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the sale, lease, or rental of water treatment systems and including effective date and applicability provisions. (See SF 229.)
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 229. S.J. 275. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, Koelker, and Quirmbach. S.J. 157. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. S.J. 84. |
Same As/Similar To
SF229 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Commerce. H.J. 1076.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF25 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF25.html |