IA SF2225 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the criminal offense of theft in the third degree and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3005.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the criminal offense of theft in the third degree and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3005.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Passed House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Passed House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | House | Fiscal note. |
2020-06-17 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 863. |
2020-06-16 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 862. |
2020-06-10 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 673. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 729. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 728. |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5077. S.J. 728. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5077. S.J. 589. |
2020-03-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 564. |
2020-03-10 | House | Passed House, yeas 100, nays none. H.J. 544. |
2020-03-10 | House | Amendment H-8078 adopted. H.J. 543. |
2020-03-10 | House | Substituted for HF 2538. H.J. 543. |
2020-03-04 | House | Amendment H-8078 filed. H.J. 488. |
2020-03-03 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 419. |
2020-03-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 412. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 479. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 476. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 276. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 271. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3005 (Related) 2020-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2225.
HSB528 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 321.
HF2538 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 565.
HSB528 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 321.
HF2538 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 565.